# Tricks for learning multiplication tables | Times tables Memorisation techniques

## The secret of understanding times table principles

### Do you want to be a brain boxer in multiplication?

Hey this is the ** tricks for learning multiplication tables**... in order to grab the secret of

**, you just need some basic things:**

*times tables Memorisation techniques*- First, you can use
**the skip counting method**, i.e counting in 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s, 10s etc. - Secondly, you can use
**the number line method**to make it easy.

Moreover, another secret which also is very simple is **the repeated addition method**, and of course the table method.

Hey now, let's discover **tricks to use when multiplying basic numbers of 1 to 12**, using some of our principles.

## Tips for learning times tables

We shall begin with the *zero (0) times table principle*

Wow, very easy.

Any number multiplied by **0** gives **0**.

Anytime you find a **0** in your multiplication question, then the answer to that question is automatically **0**.

__Example__: 4 x 0 = 0; 0 x 8 = 0

The x1 principle is the best and easiest.

It actually do not require any technique. **Any number multiplied by 1 is simply that same number itself.**

__Example__: 3 x 1= 3; 1 x 1= 1; 9 x 1= 9; 1 x 12= 12.

Do you know even numbers? Yes, then you've gotten it.

The **best technique** to apply in multiplication by **2** is **just to skip count in 2s**:

2, 4, 6, 8, 10, 12, 14, 16, 18, 20, 22, 24.

Here you'll notice that your answers are all even numbers.

__Example__: 2 x 1 = 2; 2 x 2 = 4; 3 x 2 = 6; 2 x 4 = 8

Notwithstanding, another trick here could just be to **ADD the number**, which is supposed to be **multiplied by 2**, to that very number itself.

That means you should simply **find the double of the number to multiply by 2**.

__Example__: 2 x 3 = (3 + 3) = 6; 8 x 2 = (8 + 8) = 16; 5 x 2 = (5 + 5) = 10

The fast and easiest way for a kid to know ** multiplication by 3 is simply to apply the skip counting method**.

We will first of skip count in 3s.

Let's go:** 3, 6, 9, 12, 15, 18, 21, 24, 27, 30, 33, 36**.

Now solve 3 x 4. Hey, it's easy.

Just go back to your skip counting line. Start counting from the **1 ^{st} position** which is

**3**, up to the

**4**.

^{th}positionYou'll discover that the

**4**bears the number

^{th}position**12**.

Hence, **3 x 4 = 12**

However, another tip in the **3 times table** is to multiply the given number by 2.

Then add the result to that same number, or you do the repeated addition method.

__Example__: 3 x 4 = (4 x 2) + 4 = 8 + 4 = 12 OR 4 + 4 + 4 = 8 + 4 = 12

Simple. Kids who are fast in addition can rely on this trick when multiplying number by 4.

This is because, ** multiplication by 4 is equivalent to multiplying that number by 2, two times**.

When this is done, you however add the two results.

__Example__: 6 x 4= (6 x 2) + (6 x 2) 12 + 12 = 24

Multiplication by 5 is very easy to get familiar with.

At the start, you can even try skip counting aloud in 5s.

Let's try : **5, 10, 15, 20, 25, 30, 35, 40, 45, 50, 55, 60**.

When you look keenly at the series of numbers above, you realise that each number ends with either a 5 or a 0.

Good. This means that ** an even number multiplied by 5 has a result that ends with 0**, while

**.**

*an odd number multiplied by 5 has a result that ends with 5*__Example__: 3 x 5 = 15; 6 x 5 = 30

This principle is very easy to grab.

We all know **half of 6 is 3** right.

Ok. Given that you solve **8 x 6**, the first thing to do is, simply **multiply the given number (8) by 3**;

do that exercise twice, however, obtaining two results.

Finally, you **add the two results**.

__Example__: 8 x 6= (8 x 3) + (8 x 3) = 24 + 24 = 48

Moreover, we never forget our skip counting method, which in 6s gives:** 6, 12, 18, 24, 30, 36, 42, 48, 54, 60, 66, 72**.

As earlier stated, given **8 x 6** for example, simple count from the **1 ^{st} position** up to the

**8**.

^{th}pointYou'll notice the **8 ^{th} position** is the number

**48**.

Having mastered your times table from **0** up to **6**, you automatically have become an expert.

From **x8** to **x12** will therefore no longer be a problem, but will be easy to memorise.

Here, we simply use the skip counting method

Thus in 7s; **7, 14, 21, 28, 35, 42, 49, 56, 63, 70, 71, 84**.

Given **7 x 8**, as usual, begin counting from the **1 ^{st} position** which is

**7**, up to the

**8**.

^{th}Having counted you realise that the 8th position bears the number 56. Hence, **7 x 8 = 56**

So far, we've noticed that multiplication with an even number such as **4**, **6**, and **8** has a unique principle.

So, no stress here.

Now, that unique principle here is, using half of our even number for the exercise.

Now with the **8 times table**, half of **8** is **4**.

Perfect. Therefore given the problem **6 x 8**, we simply multiply the given number (6) by **4**.

As usual, the exercise is conducted twice.

Having obtained two results, you now add (two results).

__Example__: 6 x 8 = (6 x 4) + (6 x 4) = 24 + 24 = 48

**Multiplication by 9** is one of the easiest times tables to remember.

Here it goes.

Given the problem **9 x 4**, we can resolve it through these steps:

The first thing to do is to **Add** a **0** behind the number to be multiplied by **9**.

If you do this your result will be **40**.

Next, **subtract** that number (its value) from the gotten result **(40 - 4) = 36**.

9 x 4 = 36

__Example__:Example: 9 x 9 = 90 - 9 = 81; 7 x 9 = 70 - 7 = 63

Multiplication by tens is the best and simplest times table so far.

You don't need to think twice. Just **add** a **0** to the number you want to multiply with **10**.

That's your answer.

You'll realise that your result has had an extra digit.

__Example__: 3 x 10 = 30 12 x 10 = 120

So far gone, you've noticed that ** any number multiplied by 11 means writing that number twice**, or adding the same digit next to the present one.

Hey be careful! This rule applies only from **11 x 1** up to **11 x 9**.

__Example 1__: 6 x 11= 66; 7 x 11 = 77;

For number **10**, just add a **0** at the end of **11**. So, **11 x 10 = 110**

We have particular case here for numbers up to ten (**11 x 11** and more). There is a simple formula to solve it. Let's try **11 x 12**;

__Example 2__: 11 x 12 = (11 x 10) + (11 x 2) = 110 + 22 = 132

There's just a little practice quiz to be applied when multiplying a number by 12.

It's very easy. It goes thus: ** n x 12 = (n x 10) + (n x 2)** [*here n is a number*]

__Example__: let's take n to be 3.

3 x 12 = (3 x 10) + (3 x 2) = 30 + 6 = 36

Therefore, **3 x 12 = 36**

Yeeeeees, we've got it all. It's simple!